Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0623354 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0623354



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1700
05.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.11.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.11.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
25.10.2010 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
25.10.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 3
25.10.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
20.10.2010 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
20.10.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 3
20.10.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
20.10.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
20.07.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
20.07.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
20.07.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
15.07.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.07.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
09.07.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.01.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
05.01.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
16.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
19.09.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.09.2009 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.08.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.08.2009 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.08.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
13.08.2009 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.08.2009 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2009 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.05.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
20.05.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.05.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.05.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Refund of fees Opposition 1
23.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2009 Description Opposition 5
22.04.2009 Drawings Opposition 2
22.04.2009 French translation of claims Opposition 3
22.04.2009 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
22.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.04.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
20.04.2009 Description Opposition 5
20.04.2009 Drawings Opposition 2
20.04.2009 French translation of claims Opposition 3
20.04.2009 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
20.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.04.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
06.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
04.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
24.03.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
24.03.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 30
24.03.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
01.10.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Search / examination 1
01.10.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Search / examination 1
01.10.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
26.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2008 Data sheet for the decision Search / examination 29
25.09.2008 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Search / examination 3
25.09.2008 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Search / examination 3
19.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
25.08.2008 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
22.08.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
19.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.05.2008 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 3
14.05.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
28.04.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
23.04.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 64
24.11.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 65
30.08.2006 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
28.08.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.08.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.05.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.05.2006 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.05.2006 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.05.2006 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 24
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
09.05.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
08.05.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 41
08.05.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 41
30.03.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
06.03.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
01.03.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.03.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.02.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.02.2006 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.02.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.02.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.01.2006 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.12.2005 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.12.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
27.12.2005 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.12.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.12.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 8
27.12.2005 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.12.2005 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.11.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
09.11.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
09.11.2005 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
09.11.2005 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 5
13.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.10.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.10.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.09.2005 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
12.09.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.09.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.09.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.09.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
12.09.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.09.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.09.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 31
09.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.09.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
08.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.09.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 31
07.03.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.03.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.03.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
22.02.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
22.02.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.02.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
30.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
30.07.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
06.07.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
27.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.04.2004 Claims Opposition 2
19.04.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
16.04.2004 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
06.04.2004 Request for change of address of the applicant Opposition 1
23.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.02.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.08.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.08.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.07.2003 Request for documents Opposition 1
10.07.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.07.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
10.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.07.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
04.07.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.07.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
02.07.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
02.07.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
02.07.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.07.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.07.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.07.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
02.07.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
02.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
02.07.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.08.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.07.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.07.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 8
15.04.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
21.11.2001 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
02.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
02.11.2001 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
01.11.2001 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
31.08.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.08.2001 Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) Search / examination 1
22.05.2001 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
16.05.2001 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
08.01.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
08.01.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
17.11.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
23.06.1999 Description Search / examination 4
23.06.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
10.02.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
11.07.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.03.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.1998 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.01.1998 Data sheet for the decision Search / examination 7
22.11.1997 General enquiry Search / examination 1
10.06.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
02.09.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.09.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
10.05.1994 Communication (no form) Search / examination 1
20.04.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.04.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
20.04.1994 Description Search / examination 12
20.04.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.04.1994 Drawings Search / examination 2
20.04.1994 Priority document Search / examination 24
20.04.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7