Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0622885

EP0622885 - Rotor of electric motor for compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD
2-5-5, Keihanhondori
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
[1994/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Uchibori, Masaharu
127-12 Nakano, Ohra-machi
Ohra-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Igarashi, Keijiro
803-5 Higashiajima
Ohta-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
03 / Kinoshita, Tomonori
499-1 Shimonara
Kumagaya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Miyauchi, Takashi
474-50 Takahayashi
Ohta-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
05 / Arai, Kazuhiko
B1-7, 980-3 Yoshida, Oizumi-machi
Ohra-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
[1994/44]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/44]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date94302956.125.04.1994
[1994/44]
Priority number, dateJP1993012471430.04.1993         Original published format: JP 12471493
JP1993012471530.04.1993         Original published format: JP 12471593
JP1993013414913.05.1993         Original published format: JP 13414993
JP1993013889318.05.1993         Original published format: JP 13889393
[1994/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0622885
Date:02.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0622885
Date:12.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0622885
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/27
[1994/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/44]
TitleGerman:Rotor für einen elektrischen Kompressormotor[1994/44]
English:Rotor of electric motor for compressor[1994/44]
French:Rotor pour moteur électrique de compresseur[1994/44]
Examination procedure11.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/50]
27.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2000Fee for grant paid
05.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Request for further processing for:28.10.1998Request for further processing filed
20.10.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.11.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PXA]US5258678  (FUTAMI TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [PX] 1 * column 2, line 11 - line 42; figure - * [A] 4,6-8,10-13;
 [DA]JPH02246748  ;
 [A]US4486679  (JONES DONALD W [US]) [A] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 15; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]EP0538472  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * column 5, line 34 - column 8, line 6; figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]JPH04185247  ;
 [A]JPS5972969  ;
 [DA]JPS5752359  ;
 [A]GB2217924  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4454438  (YAMASHITA SEIZI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * the whole document *;
 [D]JPS6023584  (SM IND CO LTD, et al);
 [A]US4144469  (MIYASHITA KUNIO, et al) [A] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 2; figures 5-7 *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901218), vol. 014, no. 568, Database accession no. (E - 1014), [DA] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921015), vol. 016, no. 499, Database accession no. (E - 1280), [DA] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840821), vol. 008, no. 181, Database accession no. (E - 261), [A] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820708), vol. 006, no. 123, Database accession no. (E - 117), [DA] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * abstract *