EP0680173 - Multicasting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costas Calamvokis 37 Apsley Road Clifton, Bristol / GB | 02 /
Banks, David 35 Pembroke Road Clifton, Bristol BS8 3BE / GB | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Squibbs, Robert Francis, et al Hewlett-Packard Limited IP Section, Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Squibbs, Robert Francis, et al Intellectual Property Section Building 2 Hewlett-Packard Limited Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303117.9 | 28.04.1994 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680173 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680173 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
H04L12/1881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/44] | Title | German: | Mehrfachsendeeinrichtung | [1995/44] | English: | Multicasting apparatus | [1995/44] | French: | Appareil pour envoi multidestinataire | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.09.2003 | DE | 04.12.2003 | [2006/32] |
Former [2004/44] | DE | 04.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "Multicast/broadcast mechanism for a shared buffer packet switch", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (199203), vol. 34, no. 10A, pages 464 - 465 [X] 1-4,11,12 * the whole document * | [A] - J.S. WU ET AL., "Traffic management circuit for the shared buffer memory switch with multicasting", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, GUILDFORD GB, (199311), vol. 16, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/0140-3664(93)90075-4, pages 736 - 739, XP024226508 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-3664(93)90075-4 | [A] - "Packet switching module", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (199003), vol. 32, no. 10B, pages 176 - 177 [A] 1-12 |