Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0628288

EP0628288 - Medical probe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIDAMED, INC.
1380 Willow Road, Suite 101
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[1994/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Edwards, Stuart D.
1681 Austin Avenue
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
02 / Lundquist, Ingemar H.
17 Mile Drive at the Dunes
Pebble Beach, California 93953 / US
03 / Baker, James Allen, Jr.
4292-P Wilkie Way
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
04 / Sharkey, Hugh, R.
654 Iris Street
Redwood City, California 94061 / US
05 / Lax, Ronald G.
10724 Glenbrook Estates Court
Grass Valley, California 95945 / US
[2000/12]
Former [1994/50]01 / Edwards, Stuart D.
1681 Austin Avenue
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
02 / Lindquist, Ingemar H.
17 Mile Drive at the Dunes
Pebble Beach, California 93953 / US
03 / Baker, James Allen, Jr.
4292-P Wilkie Way
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
04 / Sharkey, Hugh, R.
654 Iris Street
Redwood City, California 94061 / US
05 / Lax, Ronald G.
10724 Glenbrook Estates Court
Grass Valley, California 95945 / US
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/50]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date94303423.112.05.1994
[1994/50]
Priority number, dateUS1993006164713.05.1993         Original published format: US 61647
[1994/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0628288
Date:14.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0628288
Date:18.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0628288
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/12, A61N5/02
[2000/13]
Former International [1994/50]A61B17/39, A61B17/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/14]
Former [1994/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Medizinische Sonde[1994/50]
English:Medical probe[1994/50]
French:Sonde médicale[1994/50]
Examination procedure27.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/17]
16.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.1999Fee for grant paid
13.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5122138  (MANWARING KIM H [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 31 * * column 5, line 20 - line 34 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 1 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO9210142  (PFIZER HOSPITAL PROD [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 6, line 16 - line 30 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 12 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5007908  (RYDELL MARK A [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 18 - line 22 * * column 1, line 36 - column 45 * * column 2, line 46 - line 55 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0219216  (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 8, line 13 - page 10, line 5 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4920978  (COLVIN DAVID P [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 7 - line 25 * * column 4, line 26 - line 37 * * figures 7-10 *;
 [A]US4966597  (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [A] 4-7,14,15 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, line 36 - line 44 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB618528  (AMERICAN CYSTOSCOPE MAKERS INC) [A] 14-16 * page 4, line 34 - line 65 * * figures 1,8-10 *
ExaminationUS4565200
 US4950267
 EP0521595
 WO9315664
 WO9404220