EP0683471 - Enhancement of document security [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Bank Note Holographics, Inc. 51 West 52nd Street New York New York 10019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states AMERICAN BANK NOTE HOLOGRAPHICS, INC. 51 West 52nd Street New York, New York 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colgate, Gilbert Jr 120 East 89th Street New York, NY 10128 / US | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303519.6 | 17.05.1994 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683471 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/16, G06K19/08 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
G07F7/086 (EP,US);
G06K19/08 (EP,US);
G06K19/083 (EP,US);
G06K19/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/47] | Title | German: | Verbesserung der Sicherheit eines Dokumentes | [1995/47] | English: | Enhancement of document security | [1995/47] | French: | Amélioration de la sécurité d'un document | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/29] | 04.03.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO8502927 (FAIRVIEW PARTNERS [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * page 6, line 28 - page 9, line 31 * * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 35; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,7; | [X]US4094462 (MOSCHNER JOHN L) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 43; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]WO9216913 (SECURITY SYSTEMS CONSORTIUM LI [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figure 1; claims 1-4 * [Y] 3,6-8; | [DY]US4684795 (COLGATE JR GILBERT [US]) [DY] 3,6-8 * column W *; | [LE]US5336871 (COLGATE JR GILBERT [US]) [LE] 1-8 * column W * * corresponding document with earlier priority * |