Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0626706


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.04.1997 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  28.05.1997 [1997/22]
12.12.1996 Application deemed to be withdrawn
28.06.1996 First examination report
27.06.1996 Examination report or reply
12.06.1996 Renewal fee
13.05.1995 Request for examination filed published on  05.07.1995 [1995/27]
14.10.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.11.1994 [1994/48]