blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0626706

EP0626706 - Electrical switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.04.1997
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.1997Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.1997 [1997/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DELTA SCHOELLER LIMITED
The Moors, Tewkesbury Road Cheltenham
Glos GL51 9BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/48]For all designated states
DELTA SCHOELLER LIMITED
The Moors, Tewkesbury Road
Cheltenham, Glos GL51 9BP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hambidge, Roger Louis
24 Merestones Drive
The Park, Cheltenham GL50 2SS / GB
02 / Collings, Reginald Jeffrey
25 Wincel Road
Winchcombe, Cheltenham GL54 5YE / GB
[1994/48]
Representative(s)Weitzel, David Stanley
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/48]Weitzel, David Stanley
Batchellor, Kirk & Co., 2 Pear Tree Court, Farringdon Road
London EC1R 0DS / GB
Application number, filing date94303703.624.05.1994
[1994/48]
Priority number, dateGB1993001099627.05.1993         Original published format: GB 9310996
[1994/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0626706
Date:30.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.1994
ClassificationIPC:H01H13/60, H01H5/18
[1994/48]
CPC:
H01H13/60 (EP); H01H5/18 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/48]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Schalter[1994/48]
English:Electrical switch[1994/48]
French:Interrupteur électrique[1994/48]
Examination procedure02.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/27]
01.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/22]
16.12.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1997/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2708371  (MINNEAPOLIS-HONEYWELL REGULATOR COMPANY) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 35 - line 63 * [Y] 3-7;
 [XY]EP0112483  (BROWN,BOVERI & CIE) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 1 - line 11 * [Y] 3-7;
 [XY]US2810031  (GOSTA LUDVIG HELLSTROM) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 3 - column 6, line 54 * [Y] 3-7;
 [DY]EP0232765  (SWF AUTO-ELECTRIC GMBH) [DY] 3 * claim 5 *;
 [Y]EP0301413  (SWF AUTO-ELECTRIC GMBH) [Y] 3 * claim 11 *;
 [XY]US2598613  (ARNOLD SIMONI) [X] 8-11 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 17 * [Y] 4-7;
 [A]GB1189971  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC AND ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES LIMITED) [A] 7,10 * page 2, line 23 - line 43 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.