Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0629398

EP0629398 - Pharmaceutical preparation for controlled release of a medicinal compound at a targeted site in the intestinal tract [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.1997
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.1997Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.1997 [1997/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD.
2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/51]For all designated states
TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD.
2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Noda, Kazuo
No. 24-12, Nakayamasakuradai 2-chome
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Hirakawa, Yoshiyuki
No. 4-130-102, Koyochonaka 1-chome, Higashinada-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Yoshino, Hiroyuki
No. 8-A9-101, Yamadanishi 2-chome
Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
04 / Kubo nee Nagata, Minako
No. 17-E05-103, Kamihamuro 3-chome
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
[1994/51]
Representative(s)Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/51]Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London, EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date94304393.517.06.1994
[1994/51]
Priority number, dateJP1993014795418.06.1993         Original published format: JP 14795493
[1994/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0629398
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/50
[1994/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/51]
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Zubereitung für die kontrollierte Freisetzung einer medizinischen Substanz an einem Zielort im Darmtrakt[1994/51]
English:Pharmaceutical preparation for controlled release of a medicinal compound at a targeted site in the intestinal tract[1994/51]
French:Composition pharmaceutique à liberation contrôlée d'un principe actif sur un lieu cible dans le tractus intestinal[1994/51]
Examination procedure27.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/08]
16.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/28]
04.02.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1997/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0149120  (ELAN CORPORATION PLC) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-3,6,7 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 7 * * page 4, line 26 - line 33 *;
 [X]EP0436370  (TANABE SEIYAKU CO. LTD.) [X] 1-4,7-10 * claims 1,4 * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 36 - line 53 *