blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0631290

EP0631290 - Method of operating a nuclear fuel reprocessing plant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/52]Reprocessing plant and method of operating the same
[1999/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2000
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.2000 [2000/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Former [1994/52]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukasawa, Tetsuo
23-15 Higashionumacho 3-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
02 / Kawamura, Fumio
2-3 Hakamatsuka-1-chome
Mito-shi / JP
03 / Sasahira, Akira
2-11-2, Onumacho-2-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
04 / Nakamura, Tomotaka
15-3-2, Suwacho-4-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
05 / Ogawa, Kinya
9-9 Moriyamacho-1-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
06 / Kondo, Yoshikazu
23-7, Daiharacho-3-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
[1994/52]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/52]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date94304584.923.06.1994
[1994/52]
Priority number, dateJP1993015349924.06.1993         Original published format: JP 15349993
[1994/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0631290
Date:28.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0631290
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.1994
ClassificationIPC:G21C19/42, G21C19/46
[1994/52]
CPC:
G21C19/46 (EP); G21C19/42 (EP); Y02E30/30 (EP);
Y02W30/50 (EP)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [1999/33]
Former [1994/52]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Wiederaufbereitungsanlage für Kernbrennstoff[1999/04]
English:Method of operating a nuclear fuel reprocessing plant[1999/04]
French:Procédé pour actionner une installation de retraitement de combustible nucléaire[1999/04]
Former [1994/52]Verarbeitungsanlage und Verfahren zu deren Betrieb
Former [1994/52]Reprocessing plant and method of operating the same
Former [1994/52]Installateur de traitement et procédé pour son fonctionnement
MiscellaneousEPB 1999/42: (deleted)
EPB 1999/42: (deleted)
EPB 1999/42: (deleted)
EPB 1997/42: Teilanmeldung 97112218.9 eingereicht am 17/07/97
EPB 1997/42: Divisional application 97112218.9 filed on 17/07/97
EPB 1997/42: Demande divisionnaire 97112218.9 déposée le 17/07/97
Examination procedure12.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/52]
13.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.1999Fee for grant paid
13.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97112218.9  / EP0817207
Opposition(s)21.07.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40]
Request for further processing for:09.09.1996Request for further processing filed
10.09.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.09.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2217848  (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,12,13,18-21,26,27 * claim - * [A] 14-17,22-25;
 [X]EP0389801  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 2-4,13,18-21,26,27 * claim - *;
 [A]JPH01285899  ;
 [A]JPS60115899  ;
 [A]JPS63180894  ;
 [D]JPS63180894  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JPS6327796  ;
 [D]JPS6327796  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JPS63159793  ;
 [A]FR2586502  (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RES INST [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1990), vol. 90, no. 1, Database accession no. 90-003288, & JPH01285899 A 19891116 (NIPPON GENSHIRYOKU JIGYO, TOSHIBA KK) [A] 2-4,13,18-21,26,27 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1985), vol. 85, no. 31, Database accession no. 85-187273, & JPS60115899 A 19850622 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CO, MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - KUBE ET AL., "Modern control systems and methods for optimization of the PUREX process", KERNTECHNIK, MUNCHEN DE, (1989), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 225 - 229, XP002045583 [A] 1 * page 225, column R, line 23 - page 227, column R, line 6 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1988), vol. 88, no. 35, Database accession no. 88-247045, & JPS63180894 A 19880725 (HITACHI KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1988), vol. 88, no. 11, Database accession no. 88-073994, & JPS6327796 A 19880205 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1988), vol. 88, no. 32, Database accession no. 88-224448, & JPS63159793 A 19880702 (HITACHI KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.