Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0635521

EP0635521 - A process for the production of polypropylene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury
Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Former [1995/04]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rebhan, David Merrill
718 Regency Drive
Charleston, West Virginia 25314 / US
02 / Wibbenmayer, David Albin
120 Larimore Drive
Victoria, Texas 77904 / US
[1995/04]
Representative(s)Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/04]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date94305254.818.07.1994
[1995/04]
Priority number, dateUS1993009447719.07.1993         Original published format: US 94477
[1995/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0635521
Date:25.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0635521
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/06, C08F2/34
[1995/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polypropylen[1995/04]
English:A process for the production of polypropylene[1995/04]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de polypropylène[1995/04]
Examination procedure25.07.1994Examination requested  [1995/04]
08.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1999Fee for grant paid
13.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
PT26.04.2000
ES19.07.2000
[2004/28]
Former [2004/07]AT26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2003/45]AT26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2002/23]AT26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH01.05.2000
LI01.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0534405  (UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS CO.) [A] 1 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 18 * * abstract *;
 [A]JPS59140205  ;
 [A]DD263779  (VEB BUNA) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 38, Database accession no. 84-234420, & JPS59140205 A 00000000 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO.) [A] 1 * abstract *