Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0637159

EP0637159 - Telecommunications system sequence calling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1995/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Slusky, Ronald David
309 N. Fourth Avenue
Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US
[1995/05]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/38]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Former [1997/52]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Former [1995/05]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date94305363.720.07.1994
[1995/05]
Priority number, dateUS1993009911429.07.1993         Original published format: US 99114
[1995/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0637159
Date:01.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0637159
Date:13.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0637159
Date:15.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04M3/46, H04Q3/00
[1995/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/05]
TitleGerman:Sequentieller Anruf in einem Telekommunikationssystem[1995/05]
English:Telecommunications system sequence calling[1995/05]
French:Appareil séquentiel dans un système de télécommunication[1995/05]
Examination procedure29.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/17]
20.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2004Fee for grant paid
19.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200310   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE15.09.2004
CH15.09.2004
IT15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]BE15.09.2004
CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/46]BE15.09.2004
CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/28]BE15.09.2004
CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/27]CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/21]CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE15.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0550975  (A.T.T.) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 4 * * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 23 *;
 [Y]JPH0611154  ;
 [A]JPH0691754  ;
 [PX]US5329581  (FRIEDES) [PX] 1,2 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 11 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 12 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860521), vol. 10, no. 137, Database accession no. (E - 405)<2194> , & JP611154 A 19860107 (NIPPON DENKI) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850926), vol. 9, no. 240, Database accession no. (E - 345)<1963> , & JP6091754 A 19850523 (NIPPON DENKI) [A] 1,2 * abstract *