Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0638874

EP0638874 - A system and method for processing images of living tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL MULTIMEDIA (ISRAEL) LTD.
P.O. Box 53300
91531 Jerusalem / IL
[1999/48]
Former [1995/07]For all designated states
SOPHIS VIEW TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.
21 Havaad Haleumi Street, P.O. Box 16031
IL-91160 Jerusalem / IL
Inventor(s)01 / Bamberger, Dr. Philippe
28 Gidon Street
Jerusalem 93506 / IL
02 / Fields, Dr. Scott
41/2 Hachayil
Jerusalem 97891 / IL
03 / Leichter, ProfessorIsaac
58/14 Ben-Zachai
Jerusalem 97891 / IL
[1995/07]
Representative(s)Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [1996/31]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Former [1995/07]Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date94305925.310.08.1994
[1995/07]
Priority number, dateIL1993010669113.08.1993         Original published format: IL 10669193
[1995/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0638874
Date:15.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0638874
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/40
[1995/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/07]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Bildern eines lebenden Gewebes[1995/07]
English:A system and method for processing images of living tissue[1995/07]
French:Méthode et système pour le traitement d'images de tissu vivant[1995/07]
Examination procedure01.11.1995Examination requested  [1995/52]
18.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
27.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.06.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
05.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2000Fee for grant paid
04.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00117706.2  / EP1074939
Opposition(s)29.11.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/08]
Request for further processing for:21.08.2000Request for further processing filed
21.08.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.09.2000Decision despatched
20.03.1998Request for further processing filed
23.03.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
07.04.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
09.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.10.1995M01   Fee paid on   01.11.1995
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199603   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.1996
31.08.199704   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.1997
31.08.199805   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.1998
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
FR28.02.2001
GR28.02.2001
IT28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
NL28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
DK31.05.2001
IE10.08.2001
LU10.08.2001
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
FR28.02.2001
GR28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
NL28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
DK31.05.2001
IE10.08.2001
LU10.08.2001
Former [2004/39]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
GR28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
NL28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
DK31.05.2001
FR27.07.2001
IE10.08.2001
LU10.08.2001
Former [2004/07]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
GR28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
NL28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
DK31.05.2001
FR27.07.2001
IE10.08.2001
Former [2003/45]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
NL28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
DK31.05.2001
FR27.07.2001
IE10.08.2001
Former [2003/08]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
NL28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
FR27.07.2001
IE10.08.2001
Former [2002/48]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
FR27.07.2001
IE10.08.2001
Former [2002/26]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
ES28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
PT28.05.2001
FR27.07.2001
Former [2002/23]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
SE28.02.2001
FR27.07.2001
Former [2002/17]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
FR27.07.2001
Former [2002/13]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
CH28.02.2001
LI28.02.2001
Former [2002/10]AT28.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
Former [2002/03]BE28.02.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]US5164993  (CAPOZZI JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-17,21-24,27-31 * column 5, line 24 - line 36 * * column 6, line 23 - line 31 *;
 [PA]US5270530  (GODLEWSKI WAYNE W [US], et al) [PA] 1-17,21-24,27-33 * column A * * column 10, line 10 - column 11, line 40; figure 14 *;
 [A]US5079698  (GRENIER LEONARD E [CA], et al) [A] 34-38 * column 15, line 14 - column 16, line 7 *
 [X]  HSUAN CHANG & FITZPATRICK J M, "DISPLAYTOOL: An Image Display Utility for Sun Workstations. (Radiological Images)", PROC. OF THE SPIE; CONF: MEDICAL IMAGING II, NEWPORT BEACH, CA, USA, (19880131), vol. 914-B, pages 1210 - 1217, [X] 1,4,6-12,14-17,21-24 * page 1211, paragraph 3 * * page 1214, paragraph 7 * * page 1214, paragraph 7.2 * * page 1215, paragraph 7.3; figures 4,5 *
 [A]  BELIKOVA T P ET AL, "Work Station for Radiologist", DIP 92.PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATINAL SEMINAR ON DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING IN MEDICINE, REMOTE SENSING AND VISUALIZATION OF INFORMATION, RIGA, LATVIA, (19920421), pages 99 - 101, [A] 1-18,21-24,27-38 * page 100, line 1 - page 101, line 2 *