Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0643311

EP0643311 - Method for radar antenna pattern beam compression [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NATIONAL SPACE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY OF JAPAN
4-1 Hamamatsucho 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/24]For all designated states
NATIONAL SPACE DEVELOPMENT AGENCY OF JAPAN
4-1 Hamamatsucho 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
National Space Development
2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sezai, Toshihiro, c/o Nat. Space Dev. Agency of JP
4-1, Hamamatsucho 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1995/11]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/11]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date94306387.531.08.1994
[1995/11]
Priority number, dateJP1993024969113.09.1993         Original published format: JP 24969193
[1995/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0643311
Date:15.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/11]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0643311
Date:25.04.1995
[1995/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0643311
Date:07.05.1997
[1997/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643311
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/28, H01Q21/29
[1997/19]
Former International [1995/11]G01S7/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Keulenkompression von Radarantennen-Richtkarakteristiken[1995/11]
English:Method for radar antenna pattern beam compression[1995/11]
French:Procédé de compression du faisceau du diagramme d'antenne radar[1995/11]
Examination procedure04.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
04.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1999Fee for grant paid
19.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0534617  (NAT SPACE DEV AGENCY [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 37; figure 2 *