EP0644500 - Method and system for producing a table image having focus and context areas showing direct and indirect data representations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inxight Software, Inc. 3260 Jay Street Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2001/37] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rao, Ramana B. 50 Ina Court San Francisco, CA 94112 / US | 02 /
Card, Stuart K. 13023 La Cresta Drive Los Alto Hills, CA 94022 / US | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/12] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306846.0 | 19.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | US19930123174 | 17.09.1993 Original published format: US 123174 | US19930123496 | 17.09.1993 Original published format: US 123496 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0644500 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0644500 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644500 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G06F3/023 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/023 (EP);
G06F40/18 (EP);
G06T11/206 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/12] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Herstellung von Tabellenabbildungen mit Fokus- und Kontextzonen, die direkte und indirekte Datenrepresentationen darstellen | [2000/52] | English: | Method and system for producing a table image having focus and context areas showing direct and indirect data representations | [1995/12] | French: | Méthode et système pour réaliser une image d'une table avec champ principal et secondaire qui présentent des données directes et indirectes | [1995/12] |
Former [1995/12] | Methode und System zur Herstellung von Tabellenabbildungen mit Fokus- und Umgebungszonen, die direkte und indirekte Datenrepresentationen darstellen | Examination procedure | 18.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 15.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0619549 (MUELLER DORN GERHARD DIPL ING [DE]) [E] 1 * column W *; | [DXA]US5226118 (BAKER MICHAEL K [US], et al) [DX] 1,4,5,8 * column 3, line 27 - line 47 * * column 14, line 47 - column 17, line 29; figures 23-28 * [A] 2,9,10; | [X]GB2139846 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [X] 2,3,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9104541 (AXA CORP [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 3 *; | [A]EP0447095 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 2,9,10 * column W * | [DA] - SARKAR ET AL, "Graphical Fisheye Views of Graphs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1992 CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTER SYSTEMS, MONTEREY, CALIFORNIA, US, (199205), pages 83 - 91, XP002006588 [DA] 2,9,10 * the whole document * |