blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0643965

EP0643965 - Nicotinic acid compositions for treating hyperlipidemia [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2014
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]For all designated states
Abbott Laboratories
100 Abbott Park Rd.
Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US
Former [2009/48]For all designated states
Abbott Respiratory LLC
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
Kos Life Sciences, Inc.
2100 N. Commerce Drive
Weston, FL 33326 / US
Former [2006/42]For all designated states
KOS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
1 Cedar Brook Drive
Cranbury NJ 08512 / US
Former [1995/12]For all designated states
KOS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
1001 S. Bayshore Drive, no. 2502
Miami, FL 33131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bova, David J.
1201 South Ocean Drive
Apt. 808S
Hollywood, Florida 33019 / US
 [2013/19]
Former [1995/12]01 / Bova, David J.
1201 South Ocean Drive, Apt. 808S
Hollywood, Florida 33019 / US
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2007/50]Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [2006/42]Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [2003/01]Findlay, Alice Rosemary
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [1995/12]Rackham, Anthony Charles
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
Application number, filing date94306847.819.09.1994
[1995/12]
Priority number, dateUS1993012439220.09.1993         Original published format: US 124392
[1995/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0643965
Date:22.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643965
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1994
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/445, A61P3/06
[2012/47]
CPC:
A61K31/44 (EP,US); A61K31/455 (EP,US); A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US); A61P3/06 (EP); A61P7/00 (EP);
H01F30/12 (EP,US); H02P27/02 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1995/12]A61K31/445
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/12]
TitleGerman:Nicotinsäure enthaltende Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung der Hyperlipidämie[1995/12]
English:Nicotinic acid compositions for treating hyperlipidemia[1995/12]
French:Compositions d'acide nicotinique pour le traitement de l'hyperlipidemie[1995/12]
Examination procedure05.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/44]
25.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2003Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2013Fee for grant paid
22.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination13.08.2004Appeal received No.  T1319/04
26.10.2004Statement of grounds filed
30.12.2010Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Divisional application(s)EP10075682.4  / EP2319513
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.1996
Opposition(s)11.02.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.05.2012Request for further processing filed
17.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.05.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 14
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 15
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 16
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 17
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 18
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 19
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200007   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2000
30.09.200108   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.09.2013
IE19.09.2013
LU19.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/37]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.09.2013
IE19.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.09.2013
IE19.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE19.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT08.05.2013
ES19.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]PT09.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS63310827  ;
 [X]JPH05221854  ;
 [X]EP0349235  (HAUSER KUHRTS INC [US]) [X] 1-16* the whole document *;
 [XD]US5126145  (EVENSTAD KENNETH L [US], et al) [XD] 1-13,16 * column 3, line 18 - line 20 * * column 5, line 1 - line 4 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 5 * * example 1 *;
 [XP]EP0577504  (UPSHER SMITH LAB INC [US]) [XP] 1-16 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 22 * * page 3, line 50 - line 51 * * page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 20 * * page 4-5, examples * * claim 1 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 89-036770, & JPS63310827 A 00000000 (SANWA KAGAKU) [X] 1-13,16 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93-309117, & JPH05221854 A 00000000 (APSHER SMITH LAB.) [X] 1-13,16 * abstract *
 [X]  - J.CLIN.INVEST., (1973), vol. 52, pages 732 - 40 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 737, column L, line 16 - line 20 * * page 739, column L, line 12 - line 31 * * page 739, column R, line 14 - line 18 *
by applicantUS4965252
 US5023245
    - KNOPP ET AL., "Contrasting Effects of Unmodified and Time-Release Forms of Niacin on Lipoproteins in Hyperlipidemic Subjects: Clues to Mechanism of Action of Niacin", METABOLISM, (1985), vol. 34/7, page 647
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.