Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0653375

EP0653375 - Lever-type hoist and traction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELEPHANT CHAIN BLOCK COMPANY LIMITED
180, 2-chome, Iwamuro Osaka-Sayama-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/20]For all designated states
ELEPHANT CHAIN BLOCK COMPANY LIMITED
180, 2-chome, Iwamuro
Osaka-Sayama-shi Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Yoshitaka, Elephant Chain Block Co.Ltd.
180, 2-chome, Iwamuro
Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Okamoto, Yoshiaki, Elephant Chain Block Co.Ltd.
180, 2-chome, Iwamuro
Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Wada, Yasuo, Elephant Chain Block Co. Ltd.
180, 2-chome, Iwamuro
Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP
04 / Kobayashi, Eikichi, Elephant Chain Block Co.Ltd.
180, 2-chome, Iwamuro
Osaka Sayama-shi, Osaka / JP
[1995/20]
Representative(s)Moreland, David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/38]Moreland, David, Dr. , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Former [1995/20]Jones, Andrée Zena , et al
CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date94307025.026.09.1994
[1995/20]
Priority number, dateJP1993028249211.11.1993         Original published format: JP 28249293
JP1993031385614.12.1993         Original published format: JP 31385693
[1995/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0653375
Date:17.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0653375
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:B66D3/14
[1995/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/20]
TitleGerman:Hebelbetätigtes Hebe- und Zuggerät[1995/20]
English:Lever-type hoist and traction apparatus[1995/20]
French:Appareil de levage et de traction actionné par levier[1995/20]
Examination procedure03.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/01]
14.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1999Fee for grant paid
16.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES19.04.2000
IT19.04.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2002/26]ES19.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0533468  (ELEPHANT CHAIN BLOCK CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 51 - line 57 * * column 9, line 25 - line 49 * * figures 1,5-7 *