Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0652138

EP0652138 - Blow molding bumper beam [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO. LTD.
1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[1995/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Sugawara, Minoru, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem. Co., Ltd
1-1 Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Tomomatsu, Ryuzo, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem. Co., Ltd
1-1 Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
03 / Fukuda, Takumasa, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem. Co., Ltd
1-1 Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
04 / Nomura, Manabu, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem. Co., Ltd
1-1 Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
[1995/19]
Representative(s)Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/19]Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date94308127.303.11.1994
[1995/19]
Priority number, dateJP1993027666805.11.1993         Original published format: JP 27666893
JP1994003006028.02.1994         Original published format: JP 3006094
[1995/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0652138
Date:10.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0652138
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:B60R19/18
[1995/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/19]
TitleGerman:Stossfänger aus Blasformverfahren[1995/19]
English:Blow molding bumper beam[1995/19]
French:Pare-choc par extrusion-soufflage[1995/19]
Examination procedure19.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/51]
13.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.1999Fee for grant paid
06.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2536711  (SAFIPLAST) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0272334  (TONEN);
 [A]EP0270691  (TONEN);
 [A]EP0256174  (TOA);
 [A]DE3209464  (PORSCHE);
 [A]JPH04244451
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920113), vol. 17, no. 18, Database accession no. (M - 1352), & JP04244451 A 19920901 (FUKUHARA) [A] * abstract *