Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0654781

EP0654781 - Method of accommodating for carbon/electret telephone set variability in automatic speaker verification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.08.2001 [2001/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1995/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Sachs, Richard M.
64 Sunset Place
Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US
02 / Schoeffler, Max S.
17 Kenwood Lane
Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US
[1995/21]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [1995/21]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date94308231.309.11.1994
[1995/21]
Priority number, dateUS1993015597319.11.1993         Original published format: US 155973
[1995/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0654781
Date:24.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0654781
Date:16.04.1997
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0654781
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:G10L17/00, G10L101/023
[2000/04]
Former International [1995/21]G10L5/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/21]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Anpassung an Kohle/Elektret-Mikrofoncharakteristiken der Telefonhörers für die automatische Sprecheridentitätsprüfung[1995/21]
English:Method of accommodating for carbon/electret telephone set variability in automatic speaker verification[1995/21]
French:Méthode d'adaptation du procédé de vérification de l'identité du locuteur à des caractéristiques des microphones carbone/électret d'un combiné[1995/21]
Examination procedure03.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
23.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2000Fee for grant paid
11.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9118386  (VCS IND INC D B A VOICE CONTRO [US]) [A] 2,3,5,7,15,16,19,21 * abstract * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 12 *;
 [X]  WEBER D M ET AL, "Telephone line equalization for robust speech recognition", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1993 IEEE SOUTH AFRICAN SYMPOSIUM ON COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1993 IEEE SOUTH AFRICAN SYMPOSIUM ON COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, JAN SMUTS AIRPORT, SOUTH AFRICA, ISBN 0-7803-1292-9, FEB. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, (199306), pages 150 - 155, XP000617770 [X] 1,3,6,8,17,18 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.3] *
 [A]  SCHALK T B, "SPEAKER VERIFICATION OVER THE TELEPHONE NETWORK", SPEECH TECHNOLOGY, MAN-MACHINE VOICE COMMUNICATIONS, (19910201), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 32 - 35, XP000207992 [A] 2,3,5,7,15,16,19,21 * abstract * * page 34, column L, line 36 - column R, line 13 *