Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0658429

EP0658429 - Control circuit for regulating temperature in an ink-jet print-head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.1999
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.1999 [1999/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/25]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Widder, John A.
3015 NE 20th Avenue
Portland, OR 97212 / US
02 / Nicholson, Peter C.
13819 SE 20th Circle
Vancouver, WA 98684 / US
[1995/25]
Representative(s)Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/25]Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date94308740.325.11.1994
[1995/25]
Priority number, dateUS1993016759514.12.1993         Original published format: US 167595
[1995/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0658429
Date:21.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0658429
Date:20.03.1996
[1996/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0658429
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/38, B41J2/365, B41J2/05, B41J2/07
[1996/11]
Former International [1995/25]B41J2/05, B41J2/07
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/25]
TitleGerman:Steuerschaltung zur Regelung der Temperatur in einem Tintenstrahldruckkopf[1995/25]
English:Control circuit for regulating temperature in an ink-jet print-head[1995/25]
French:Circuit de contrôle pour réguler la température dans une tête d'impression à jet d'encre[1995/25]
Examination procedure26.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
16.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.10.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.1997Fee for grant paid
18.11.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.01.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4568817  (S. LENG ET AL.) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 34 - line 46 * * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 3; figures 5,6 * [A] 3,6,8;
 [YA]JPH04105957  ;
 [A]JPS63185658  ;
 [A]JPS62116168  ;
 [A]JPS63134260  ;
 [A]US4376942  (J.E. TOTH ET AL.) [A] 1,6,8 * column 14, line 6 - line 62 *;
 [A]EP0475638  (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY) [A] 1,6,8 * page 3, line 32 - line 41 *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920727), vol. 16, no. 346, Database accession no. (M - 1286), & JP04105957 A 00000000 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3,6,8
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881202), vol. 12, no. 459, Database accession no. (M - 770)<3306> , & JP63185658 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2,6,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871030), vol. 11, no. 333, Database accession no. (M - 637)<2780> , & JP62116168 A 19870527 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,4,6,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881012), vol. 12, no. 381, Database accession no. (M - 752)<3228> , & JP63134260 A 00000000 (NIPPON SIGNAL CO LTD) [A] 1,2,6,8 * abstract *