blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0656577

EP0656577 - A computer with increased functionality [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.06.2002  [2002/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR International, Inc.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton
Ohio 45479 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
NCR International, Inc.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Former [1995/23]For all designated states
AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Heredia, Rafael
1100 Kensington Lake Drive
Easley, SC 29642 / US
02 / Sodon, Richard E.
10 Mimosa Lane
Piscataway, NJ 08854-5903 / US
[1995/23]
Representative(s)Cleary, Fidelma, et al
NCR Limited
International Patent Department
206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Cleary, Fidelma, et al
International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Former [1996/24]Robinson, Robert George, et al
International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley
London N12 8QJ / GB
Former [1995/23]Robinson, Robert George
International Patent Department, AT&T GIS Limited, 915 High Road, North Finchley
London N12 8QJ / GB
Application number, filing date94308819.529.11.1994
[1995/23]
Priority number, dateUS1993016074903.12.1993         Original published format: US 160749
[1995/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0656577
Date:07.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0656577
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.1995
ClassificationIPC:G06F1/16
[1995/23]
CPC:
G06F1/1616 (EP); G06F1/1643 (EP); G06F1/1656 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/23]
TitleGerman:Ein Rechner mit erhöhter Funktionelltätigkeit[1995/23]
English:A computer with increased functionality[1995/23]
French:Ordinateur avec fonctionnalité accrue[1995/23]
Examination procedure07.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/05]
22.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2001Fee for grant paid
26.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0053061  (E.P.D. ENGINEERING PROJECT DEVELOPMENT) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 14 - page 4, line 20 * * page 12, line 11 - line 17 *;
 [A]US4412300  (WATSON R. E. ET AL) [A] 2 * column 4, line 6 - line 23 * * column 10, line 26 - line 47 *;
 [A]EP0047078  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS) [A] 3 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.