Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0655680

EP0655680 - Arithmetic and logic unit having a plurality of independent sections and a register for storing the status bits [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/22]Arithmetic logic unit having plural independent sections and register storing resultant indicator bit from every section
[1998/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2000
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/22]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Balmer, Keith
6 Salcombe Close
Bedford / GB
02 / Guttag, Karl M.
3907 Oakmont Ct.
Sugar Land, Texas 55479 / US
03 / Ing-Simmons, Nicholas
47 Highfield Avenue, Alconbury
Weston, Cambridgeshire, PE17 5JS / GB
04 / Gove, Robert J.
1405 Scarborough Lane
Plano, Texas 75075 / US
05 / Golston, Jeremiah E.
2930 Mesquite
Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US
06 / Read, Christopher J.
11807 Burlingame
Houston, Texas 77099 / US
07 / Poland, Sydney W.
22307 Prince George
Katy, Texas 77449 / US
[1995/22]
Representative(s)Blanco White, Henry Nicholas , et al
ABEL & IMRAY
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/22]Blanco White, Henry Nicholas , et al
ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date94308833.630.11.1994
[1995/22]
Priority number, dateUS1993015874230.11.1993         Original published format: US 158742
[1995/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0655680
Date:31.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0655680
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/38, G06F9/30
[1995/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/22]
TitleGerman:Arithmetisch-logische Einheit mit mehreren unabhängigen Abschnitten und ein Register zur Speicherung der Statusbits[1999/30]
English:Arithmetic and logic unit having a plurality of independent sections and a register for storing the status bits[1998/29]
French:Unité arithmétique et logique ayant plusieurs sections indépendantes et un registre pour stocker les bits de status[1998/29]
Former [1995/22]Arithmetisch-logische Einheit mit mehrfachen unabhängigen Abteilungen und Register zur Speicherung des Zustandskennzeichenbits jedes Teils
Former [1995/22]Arithmetic logic unit having plural independent sections and register storing resultant indicator bit from every section
Former [1995/22]Unité arithmétique et logique ayant plusieures sections indépendantes et régistre pour emmagasiner un bit indicateur du résultant pour chaque section
Examination procedure24.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/04]
14.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.1999Fee for grant paid
11.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL28.07.1999
[2003/08]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0395348  (APPLE COMPUTER, INC.) [X] 1-6,11,15-36 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4103882  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP.) [A] 9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0437207  (FUJITSU LIMITED);
 [DA]US5197140  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.)