Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0660424

EP0660424 - Oxide superconductor and method of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL SUPERCONDUCTIVITY TECHNOLOGY CENTER
No. 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL SUPERCONDUCTIVITY TECHNOLOGY CENTER
No. 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL SUPERCONDUCTIVITY TECHNOLOGY CENTER
No. 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Adachi, Seiji
317-203, Oaza Harigaya
Fujimi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Jin, Changqin
9-2-212, Nishiasakusa 2-chome
Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Wu, Xiao-Jing
8-3-3-105, Wakamatsucho 2-chome
Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
04 / Yamauchi, Hisao
2-409, Ka 750
Nagareyama-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
05 / Tanaka, Shoji
5-25-103, Kitashinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1995/26]
Representative(s)Allam, Peter Clerk
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/26]Allam, Peter Clerk
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
Application number, filing date94309597.620.12.1994
[1995/26]
Priority number, dateJP1993032854724.12.1993         Original published format: JP 32854793
[1995/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0660424
Date:28.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0660424
Date:27.08.1997
[1997/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0660424
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01L39/12
[1995/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/26]
TitleGerman:Oxydsupraleiter und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1995/26]
English:Oxide superconductor and method of producing same[1995/26]
French:Supraconducteur d'oxyde et procédé de fabrication[1995/26]
Examination procedure06.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
30.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[PX]  JIN C -Q ET AL, "117 K superconductivity in the Ba-Ca-Cu-O system", PHYSICA C, 10 APRIL 1994, NETHERLANDS, ISSN 0921-4534, vol. 223, no. 3-4, pages 238 - 242, XP002034510 [PX] 1,3 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO9513628
 EP0608100
    R.J.CAVA, "Parent structure superconducts", NATURE, LONDON, GB, (19910613), vol. 351, pages 518 - 519,