Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0662771

EP0662771 - Transmission and reception of program information [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10333 North Meridian Street
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10330 North Meridian St
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chaney, John William
18019 Sun Ridge Circle
Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US
02 / Bridgewater, Kevin Elliott
290 South Muessing Road
Indianapolis, Indiana 46229 / US
[1995/28]
Representative(s)Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte , et al
Technicolor
European Patent Operations
1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte , et al
Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
Former [1998/14]Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte , et al
THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR
Former [1996/14]Ahrens, Thomas , et al
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Department, Göttinger Chaussee 76
D-30453 Hannover / DE
Former [1995/28]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date94309601.621.12.1994
[1995/28]
Priority number, dateGB1994000010105.01.1994         Original published format: GB 9400101
US1994024991526.05.1994         Original published format: US 249915
[1995/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0662771
Date:12.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0662771
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16, H04N7/58
[1995/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [1995/28]
TitleGerman:Sendung und Empfang von Programminformation[1995/28]
English:Transmission and reception of program information[1995/28]
French:Transmission et réception d'information de programmes[1995/28]
Examination procedure12.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/11]
21.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.1999Fee for grant paid
02.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US4264925  (FREEMAN MICHAEL J, et al) [A] 1-14 * column A *
 [A]  BOYER, "DIGITAL BROADCAST SATELLITE SYSTEM", 18TH INTERNATIONAL TELEVISION SYMPOSIUM AND TECHNICAL EXHIBITION, MONTREUX, SWITZERLAND, (19930615), pages 458 - 462, [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  BESTLER, "FLEXIBLE DATA STRUCTURES AND INTERFACE RITUALS FOR RAPID DEVELOPMENT OF OSD APPLICATIONS", 42ND ANNUAL CONVENTION AND EXPOSITION OF THE NATIONAL CABLE TELEVISION ASSOCIATION, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, (19930609), pages 223 - 236, XP000410503 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  COX ET AL., "EXTENDED SERVICES IN A DIGITAL COMPRESSED SYSTEM", 42ND ANNUAL CONVENTION AND EXPOSITION OF THE NATIONAL CABLE TELEVISION ASSOCIATION, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, (19930609), pages 185 - 191, [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  DAILY, "ADDRESSABLE DECODER WITH DOWNLOADABLE OPERATION", 42ND ANNUAL CONVENTION AND EXPOSITION OF THE NATIONAL CABLE TELEVISION ASSOCIATION, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, (19930609), pages 82 - 89, XP000410485 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *