blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0665468


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
03.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
14.12.1999 Renewal fee
18.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
20.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.03.1999 Examination report or reply
15.12.1998 Renewal fee
05.10.1998 Examination report or reply
31.03.1998 Examination report or reply
02.02.1998 Examination report or reply
03.12.1997 Renewal fee
19.09.1997 First examination report
13.09.1997 Examination report or reply
19.12.1996 Change - applicant published on  05.02.1997 [1997/06]
29.11.1996 Renewal fee
19.01.1996 Request for examination filed published on  06.03.1996 [1996/10]
16.06.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.08.1995 [1995/31]