blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0665468
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH07209873Global Dossier 11.08.1995A
Priority number Date
GB9326553 30.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0665468Global Dossier 19.04.2000B1
EP0665468 02.08.1995A1
Priority number Date
GB9326553 30.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2139278 01.07.1995A1
Priority number Date
GB9326553 30.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424031D 25.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
GB9326553 30.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424031T 14.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
GB9326553 30.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9326553D 02.03.1994D0
Priority number Date
GB9326553 30.12.1993