blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0665468

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted19.04.2000
Opposition procedure20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.04.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.08.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:06.03.1996 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19960105
 
Event date:05.02.1997 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:MACDERMID IMAGING TECHNOLOGY INC.
 
Event date:05.11.1997 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19970918
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:25.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69424031
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000525
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:02.06.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:13.07.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.
 
Event date:04.04.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:08.01.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20030108
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.12.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031231
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*MACDERMID IMAGING TECHNOLOGY INC.
Effective DATE:20031231
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20131227
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20131230
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20131217
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20131224
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69424031 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:30.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69424031 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:14.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20141228
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20141228