Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0665468

EP0665468 - Staining inhibitor for photopolymerizable compositions containing a tetrazole [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MacDermid Imaging Technology Inc.
245 Freight Street
Waterbury, CT 06702 / US
[1997/06]
Former [1995/31]For all designated states
HERCULES INCORPORATED
1313 N. Market Street, Hercules Plaza
Wilmington, Delaware 19894-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mayes, Richard Thomas
262 South Dillwyn Road
Newark, Delaware 19711 / US
[1995/31]
Representative(s)De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1995/31]
Application number, filing date94309909.329.12.1994
[1995/31]
Priority number, dateGB1993002655330.12.1993         Original published format: GB 9326553
[1995/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0665468
Date:02.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0665468
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/085
[1995/31]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/31]
TitleGerman:Ein Tetrazol enthaltender Verfärbungsinhibitor für photopolymerisierbare Zusammensetzungen[1995/31]
English:Staining inhibitor for photopolymerizable compositions containing a tetrazole[1995/31]
French:Agent anti-tache pour des compositions photopolymérisables contenant un tétrazole[1995/31]
Examination procedure05.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/10]
18.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS5948752  ;
 [X]US4629679  (UCHIDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 45 - line 51; claims 1,6,8 *;
 [X]JPS59125726  ;
 [Y]US4741987  (TOHDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 40 - line 54; claim 1 *;
 [X]JPH01223444
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840713), vol. 08, no. 151, Database accession no. (P - 286), [XY] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841121), vol. 8, no. 254, Database accession no. (P - 315), [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891205), vol. 13, no. 540, Database accession no. (P - 969), [X] 1 * abstract *