Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0674405 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0674405



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1304
06.08.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
10.03.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.03.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
04.03.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
23.02.2011 French translation of claims Opposition 3
23.02.2011 German translation of the claims Opposition 4
23.02.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.02.2011 French translation of claims Opposition 3
22.02.2011 German translation of the claims Opposition 4
22.02.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
22.02.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
26.11.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
26.11.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
26.11.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
23.11.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.08.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
10.08.2010 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
10.08.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
10.08.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
10.08.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
10.08.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.08.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
10.08.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.08.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.07.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2010 Claims Opposition 6
26.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
26.07.2010 Claims Opposition 6
26.07.2010 Drawings Opposition 1
26.07.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
23.07.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 23
13.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
29.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
25.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
25.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
22.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2010 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
21.01.2010 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.2010 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
11.01.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.04.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 19
01.02.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
01.02.2005 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 9
03.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.12.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
27.12.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.12.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.12.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
27.12.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
27.12.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
27.12.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.12.2004 Claims Appeal 8
24.12.2004 Claims Appeal 8
24.12.2004 Claims Appeal 9
24.12.2004 Claims Appeal 9
24.12.2004 Claims Appeal 8
24.12.2004 Claims Appeal 8
24.12.2004 Description Appeal 4
24.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 58
23.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 94
13.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.10.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.10.2004 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
14.10.2004 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
14.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.10.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.10.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
13.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.10.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.10.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
05.10.2004 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
04.10.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.05.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.05.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.12.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2003 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
10.10.2003 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
30.01.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
17.12.2002 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
17.12.2002 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
05.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.08.2002 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.08.2002 Claims Appeal 3
02.08.2002 Claims Appeal 7
02.08.2002 Claims Appeal 7
02.08.2002 Claims Appeal 3
02.08.2002 Claims Appeal 7
02.08.2002 Claims Appeal 3
02.08.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
31.07.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
22.05.2002 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
13.05.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.05.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.05.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
25.04.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.04.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 44
02.04.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 8
26.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
25.02.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Claims Opposition 7
22.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
22.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
06.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
31.01.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
28.01.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.2002 Claims Opposition 7
25.01.2002 Claims Opposition 6
25.01.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.01.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
10.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
10.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
21.06.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
21.06.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
18.06.2001 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
15.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.03.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
09.03.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 5
01.03.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.02.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.05.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.04.2000 Claims Opposition 7
18.04.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
17.04.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
14.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.03.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.03.2000 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
31.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.09.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.09.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.07.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.07.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.07.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 21
19.07.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 65
19.07.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 29
19.07.1999 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 56
19.07.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
10.09.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.07.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
01.07.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
27.04.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
16.04.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.12.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
23.12.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
15.12.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
30.06.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
30.06.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.04.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.03.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
31.01.1997 Claims Search / examination 6
31.01.1997 Description Search / examination 4
31.01.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.01.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
02.12.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.07.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.07.1996 General enquiry Search / examination 1
04.07.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.07.1995 European search report Search / examination 2
15.02.1995 Drawings Search / examination 2
15.02.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.02.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.02.1995 Priority document Search / examination 40
30.12.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.12.1994 Claims Search / examination 8
30.12.1994 Description Search / examination 26
30.12.1994 Drawings Search / examination 2
30.12.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7