EP0634104 - Microbiological decontamination of edible plantbulbs such as garlic and onions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUCROS Z.I. Le Terradou F-84200 Carpentras / FR | [1995/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ollivier, Gilbert 14, rue du Maine F-59210 Coudekerque-Branche / FR | 02 /
Mastorino, Eric 15 rue Plan du Bourg F-13200 Arles / FR | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Leboyer, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Leboyer 12, rue du Helder 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Leboyer, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Leboyer 12 rue du Helder F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401607.0 | 12.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | FR19930008601 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9308601 | [1995/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634104 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634104 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/00, A23B7/16 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
A23B7/00 (EP);
A23B7/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Mikrobiologische Dekontamination von essbaren Pflanzenzwiebeln, wie Knoblauch und Zwiebeln | [1995/03] | English: | Microbiological decontamination of edible plantbulbs such as garlic and onions | [1995/03] | French: | Procédé pour la décontamination microbiologique des bulbes comestibles, notamment d'ail et d'oignon | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 18.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Request for further processing for: | 28.05.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2001 | GB | 12.12.2001 | GR | 12.12.2001 | IE | 12.12.2001 | IT | 12.12.2001 | NL | 12.12.2001 | DK | 12.03.2002 | PT | 12.03.2002 | SE | 12.03.2002 | DE | 13.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | LU | 12.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
GB | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
LU | 12.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
GB | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
GB | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
GB | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
GB | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
GB | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
GB | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 12.12.2001 | |
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 12.12.2001 | |
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 12.12.2001 | |
IE | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | IE | 12.12.2001 | |
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 12.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2476774 (SEARS RALPH J) [A] 1,2,4* column 1, lines 8-16 - column 2, lines 6-43; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2752250 (MORRIS KASSER) [Y] 1,4,10 * column 1, line 15 - line 20; figure -; claim 2 1 * * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 32 *; | [YD]EP0212583 (TOSHIMITSU KAWAMURA) [YD] 1,4,10 * exemple 1, in particular page 12, lines 10-11; exemple 2, in particular page13, lines 20-22; revendication 1,10 * * page 7, line 27 - line 30 * |