Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0641542

EP0641542 - Non-invasive blood analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/10]Non-invasive blood analyzer and method using the same
[2002/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ishihara, Ken
1-15, Chigusa 1-chome Takarazuka-shi
Hyogo 665 / JP
For all designated states
SYSMEX CORPORATION
5-1 Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-Shi
Hyogo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
Ishihara, Ken
1-15, Chigusa 1-chome
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665 / JP
For all designated states
Sysmex Corporation
5-1 Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-Shi
Hyogo / JP
Former [1995/10]For all designated states
Ishihara, Ken
1-15, Chigusa 1-chome
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
For all designated states
TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
2-1, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishihara, Ken
1-15 Chigusa 1-Chome
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Hiroshi
6-11 Shofudai 1-Chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Watanabe, Mitsuru
8-6 Momoyamadai 6-Chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
04 / Asano, Kaoru
17-19 Nakano 1-Chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
05 / Suzuki, Akio
C-502, 2001-18, Nishifutami, Futami-cho
Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
06 / Maekawa, Yasunori
35-111, Asahigaoka, Bessho-cho
Miki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
[1995/10]
Representative(s)Orès, Bernard , et al
Cabinet ORES
36, rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/10]Orès, Bernard , et al
Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94401944.701.09.1994
[1995/10]
Priority number, dateJP1993022014703.09.1993         Original published format: JP 22014793
JP1994005625925.03.1994         Original published format: JP 5625994
[1995/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0641542
Date:08.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0641542
Date:06.10.1999
[1999/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0641542
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[1995/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/10]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur unblutigen Blutanalyse[2002/18]
English:Non-invasive blood analyzer[2002/18]
French:Appareil d'analyse non invasive du sang[2002/18]
Former [1995/10]Vorrichtung zur unblutigen Blutanalyse und Verfahren unter Verwendung derselben
Former [1995/10]Non-invasive blood analyzer and method using the same
Former [1995/10]Appareil d'analyse non invasive du sang et procédé l'utilisant
Examination procedure28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
02.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2002Fee for grant paid
19.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
19.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.11.2002
IT27.11.2002
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]FR27.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9203965  (CADELL THEODORE E [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7,10,11,13,14 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5069214  (SAMARAS GEORGE M [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0359554  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3,6,7,10,11,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3824393  (BRAIN A) [Y] 4 * column 17, line 50 - column 18, line 12 *;
 [AD]US4998533  (WINKELMAN JAMES W [US]) [AD] 1,15,16,18,19,21,22 * the whole document *