Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0643361

EP0643361 - Electric terminal with memory card reader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM
6, Avenue d'Iéna
75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR
[2000/05]
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM
6, Avenue d'Iéna
F-75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Sarradin, Jean-Louis
21 rue du Fossé Lézard
F-95190 Fontenay en Parisis / FR
[1995/11]
Representative(s)Bloch, Gérard , et al
Gevers France
41, Avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/11]Bloch, Gérard , et al
2, square de l'Avenue du Bois
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94401997.508.09.1994
[1995/11]
Priority number, dateFR1993001091114.09.1993         Original published format: FR 9310911
[1995/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0643361
Date:15.03.1995
Language:FR
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643361
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0643361
Date:04.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/06
[1995/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/26]
Former [1995/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronischer Terminal mit Speicherkartenleser[1995/11]
English:Electric terminal with memory card reader[1995/11]
French:Terminal électronique avec lecteur pour carte à mémoire[1995/11]
Examination procedure05.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/27]
27.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.11.2000   
Motorola Inc.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, Ill. 60196 / US
Opponent's representative
Hudson, Peter David, et al
Motorola
European Intellectual Property
Midpoint
Alencon Link, Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2000/52]
Opponent(s)01  01.11.2000   
Motorola Inc.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, Ill. 60196 / US
Opponent's representative
Hudson, Peter David, et al
Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
06.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.02.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2001Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.11.2001Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.12.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.04.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.06.2002Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
LU08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2002/42]AT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/09]AT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT02.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0480334  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 27 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]FR2685967  (GUIBERT HERVE [FR], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0274302  (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *