Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0643365

EP0643365 - Device and method for emulating a personal computer printer from a facsimile printer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM Société anonyme française
6, Avenue d'Iéna
75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR
[2000/05]
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM Société anonyme française
6, Avenue d'Iéna
F-75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Picard, François
2, rue des Nonnains, Appt 99
F-78700 Conflans / FR
[1995/11]
Representative(s)Bloch, Gérard , et al
Gevers France
41, Avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/11]Bloch, Gérard , et al
2, square de l'Avenue du Bois
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94402033.813.09.1994
[1995/11]
Priority number, dateFR1993001091214.09.1993         Original published format: FR 9310912
[1995/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0643365
Date:15.03.1995
Language:FR
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643365
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06K15/00, H04N1/00
[1995/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/11]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Emulation eines PC-Druckers von einem Faksimiledrucker[1995/11]
English:Device and method for emulating a personal computer printer from a facsimile printer[1995/11]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'émulation d'une imprimante pour ordinateur personnel à partir d'une imprimante de télécopieur[1995/11]
Examination procedure05.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/27]
04.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.02.2000
GR02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
LU13.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
FR30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2008/41]
Former [2004/39]AT02.02.2000
GR02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
LU13.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2004/07]AT02.02.2000
GR02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/08]AT02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/42]AT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/13]AT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2001/17]AT02.02.2000
IE02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/09]AT02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT02.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]US4991200  (LIN PAUL [TW]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 8, line 67 - column 10, line 29; figure - *;
 [A]JPH01168158  ;
 [DA]EP0519253  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
 [A]  - "Use of GIII Facsimile as an Image Scanner and a Printer", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198712), vol. 30, no. 7, pages 307 - 310, [A] 1,5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891003), vol. 13, no. 439, Database accession no. (E - 827), [A] 1,5 * abstract *
by applicantEP0519253
 US4991200