Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0645902

EP0645902 - Satellite system for data transmission between telephone branch exchanges, traffic station and transmission method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue de la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1995/13]For all designated states
ALCATEL TELSPACE
5, rue Noel Pons
F-92734 Nanterre Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bringer, Bernard
4, Avenue Condorcet
F-92700 Colombes / FR
[1995/13]
Representative(s)Scheer, Luc , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30 Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
[2009/26]
Former [1999/19]Scheer, Luc , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [1995/13]Pothet, Jean Rémy Emile Ludovic , et al
c/o SOSPI 14-16 rue de la Baume
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94402085.820.09.1994
[1995/13]
Priority number, dateFR1993001133823.09.1993         Original published format: FR 9311338
[1995/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0645902
Date:29.03.1995
Language:FR
[1995/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0645902
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/212
[1995/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1995/13]
TitleGerman:Satellitenanordnung für Datenübertragung zwischen Telefonvermittlungstellen, Verkehrstation und Übertragungsverfahren dafür[1995/13]
English:Satellite system for data transmission between telephone branch exchanges, traffic station and transmission method therefor[1995/13]
French:Système de transmission de données par satellite entre centres de commutation téléphoniques, station de trafic et procédé de transmission correspondants[1995/13]
Examination procedure21.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2000Fee for grant paid
08.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2002/26]ES26.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0324363  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 27; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0213640  (COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE CORP [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 3 *;
 [A]  BELLA ET AL, "Role of ISDN Signaling for a satellite System with On-Bord Processing", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, NEW-YORK,US;, (199208), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 1066 - 1080, XP000296622 [A] 1,8,9 * figures 1-7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.144893
 [DA]  BRINGER ET AL, "Telephonie applications on TDMA satellite system", COMMUTATION AND TRANSMISSION, PARIS,FR;, (1992), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 49 - 54, XP000257952 [DA] 1,8,9 * the whole document *