Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0650665

EP0650665 - Security side system for silage loader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kuhn-Audureau S.A.
Rue Quinquese
85260 La Copechagnière / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
Kuhn-Audureau S.A.
Rue Quinquese
85260 La Copechagniere / FR
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
AUDUREAU
La Copechagnière
F-85260 L'HERBERGEMENT / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bonnaudet, Jean-Claude
La Copechagnière
F-85260 l'Herbergement / FR
[1995/18]
Representative(s)Fruchard, Guy , et al
Cabinet Boettcher
16, Rue Médéric
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Fruchard, Guy , et al
Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1995/18]Fruchard, Guy , et al
CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boetie
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94402332.418.10.1994
[1995/18]
Priority number, dateFR1993001281527.10.1993         Original published format: FR 9312815
[1995/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0650665
Date:03.05.1995
Language:FR
[1995/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0650665
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:A01F25/20
[1995/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   IT,   NL [1995/18]
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsvorrichtung für die Seite einer Silagefutterentnahmevorrichtung[1995/18]
English:Security side system for silage loader[1995/18]
French:Dispositif de sécurité latérale pour une fraise de désilage[1995/18]
Examination procedure21.10.1994Examination requested  [1995/18]
27.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.1999Fee for grant paid
02.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
03.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3837509  (STRAUTMANN & SOEHNE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2541860  (LUCAS SA G [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 17 - page 4; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE1481446  (BERNHARD STRAUTMANN & SOEHNE O) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 2; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]FR2618047  (ARIAT [FR], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 6, line 32 - line 34; figures 1,3 *