blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0652331

EP0652331 - Sound absorbing panel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.01.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN
18, avenue d'Alsace
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
[1995/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Zinzius, Roger
de la cote Chalonnaise
F-71640 Givry / FR
02 / Bourdon, Eric
10, av. du Général de Gaulle
F-78290 Croissy sur Seine / FR
03 / Rias, Jean-Claude
23 domaine des Guérandes - Medan
F-78670 Villenne sur Seine / FR
[1995/19]
Representative(s)Muller, René
SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE
39, quai Lucien Lefranc
93303 Aubervilliers / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/19]Muller, René
SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc-BP 135
F-93303 Aubervilliers Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date94402523.808.11.1994
[1995/19]
Priority number, dateFR1993001329008.11.1993         Original published format: FR 9313290
[1995/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0652331
Date:10.05.1995
Language:FR
[1995/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0652331
Date:18.03.1998
Language:FR
[1998/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.1995
ClassificationIPC:E04B1/86, B32B15/12
[1995/19]
CPC:
B32B15/12 (EP,US); B32B15/20 (US); B32B29/02 (US);
B32B3/266 (US); B32B5/26 (US); E04B1/86 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (US); B32B2315/085 (US); B32B2315/14 (US);
B32B2317/10 (US); B32B2317/122 (US); E04B2001/8461 (EP);
E04B2001/848 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/19]
TitleGerman:Schalldämmende Platte[1995/19]
English:Sound absorbing panel[1995/19]
French:Panneau absorbant acoustique[1995/19]
Examination procedure03.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/35]
22.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1997Fee for grant paid
11.10.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.03.1998
DK18.06.1998
SE18.06.1998
CH30.11.1998
LI30.11.1998
[2008/05]
Former [2003/45]IT18.03.1998
DK18.06.1998
SE18.06.1998
CH30.11.1998
LI30.11.1998
Former [2000/52]IE18.03.1998
IT18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
CH30.11.1998
LI30.11.1998
Former [1999/42]IE18.03.1998
IT18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
Former [1999/16]IE18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
Former [1998/43]SE18.06.1998
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5514835B  ;
 [A]JPS55164150  ;
 [X]CH287796  (GYPROC PRODUCTS LIMITED [GB]);
 [X]FR2150611  (LALANNE RENE [FR]);
 [A]FR2321020  (SO GE CO [FR]);
 [DA]FR2683612  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.