blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0659741


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.06.2009 Change - representative published on  22.07.2009  [2009/30]
16.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
15.12.2000 Change - representative published on  31.01.2001 [2001/05]
24.11.2000 Change - representative published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
03.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
23.12.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.12.1999 Renewal fee
16.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.06.1999 First examination report
08.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.12.1998 Renewal fee
13.03.1998 Change - applicant published on  29.04.1998 [1998/18]
13.03.1998 Change - representative published on  29.04.1998 [1998/18]
15.12.1997 Renewal fee
12.12.1996 Renewal fee
12.01.1996 Change - applicant published on  28.02.1996 [1996/09]
12.01.1996 Change - representative published on  28.02.1996 [1996/09]
07.10.1995 Request for examination filed published on  29.11.1995 [1995/48]
12.05.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.06.1995 [1995/26]