blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0659741
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2769983BGlobal Dossier 25.06.1998B2
JPH0834772 06.02.1996A
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0659741Global Dossier 19.04.2000B1
EP0659741 28.06.1995A1
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2138884 06.02.2001C
CA2138884 24.06.1995A1
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1057084C 04.10.2000C
CN1107841 06.09.1995A
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424024D 25.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424024T 28.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2147775T 01.10.2000T3
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2714379 02.02.1996B1
FR2714379 30.06.1995A1
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR950017950 22.07.1995A
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2118315 27.08.1998C1
RU94044354 27.10.1996A
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG43113 17.10.1997A1
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW472040B 11.01.2002B
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5493021 20.02.1996A
Priority number Date
FR9315775 23.12.1993