Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0659741

EP0659741 - Process for the preparation of lactams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA FIBER & RESIN INTERMEDIATES
25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[1998/18]
Former [1996/09]For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC FIBER & RESIN INTERMEDIATES
25 quai Paul Doumer
92405 Courbevoie / FR
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE
25, Quai Paul Doumer
F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Barratt, David
22, Falstone Avenue
Ramsbottom Bury BL 09LX / GB
02 / Gilbert, Laurent
354, rue André Philip
F-69007 Lyon / FR
[1995/26]
Representative(s)Esson, Jean-Pierre , et al
Rhodia Services
Direction de la Propriété Industrielle
CRIT-Carrières
B.P. 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Esson, Jean-Pierre , et al
Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRIT-Carrières B.P. 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR
Former [2001/05]Esson, Jean-Pierre , et al
Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches de Lyon, BP 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
Former [2001/02]Esson, Jean-Pierre , et al
RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Former [1998/18]Vignally, Noel , et al
RHODIA CHIMIE Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches des Carrières, B.P. 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
Former [1995/26]Vignally, Noel
RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches des Carrières, B.P. 62
F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date94420341.306.12.1994
[1995/26]
Priority number, dateFR1993001577523.12.1993         Original published format: FR 9315775
[1995/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0659741
Date:28.06.1995
Language:FR
[1995/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0659741
Date:19.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07D201/08
[1995/26]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Laktamen[1995/26]
English:Process for the preparation of lactams[1995/26]
French:Procédé de préparation de lactame[1995/26]
Examination procedure28.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/48]
11.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1999Fee for grant paid
16.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:SearchJPH0726847  [ ] (ACT KK);
 [A]EP0150295  (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1 *Page 20-22: révendications*;
 [A]FR2029540  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1 *Page 9: révendications*;
 [DA]US2357484  (LOUIS MARTIN ELMORE) [DA] 1 *Colonne 1*;
 [DA]US4628085  (MARES FRANK [US], et al) [DA] 1 *Colonnes 9-12: révendications*
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19710503), vol. 74, no. 18, Database accession no. 91756t, [A] 1-10 * abstract *