Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0629615

EP0629615 - Indole derivatives as glutamate antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NeuroSearch A/S
Pederstrupvej 93
2750 Ballerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
NEUROSEARCH A/S
Pederstrupvej 93
2750 Ballerup / DK
Former [1994/51]For all designated states
NEUROSEARCH A/S
Smedeland 26B
DK-2600 Glostrup / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Wätjen, Frank
22 Afaldet
DK-2730 Herlev / DK
02 / Drejer, Jorgen
10 Skandrups Allé
DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK
03 / Jensen, Leif Helth
6 Puggardsgade
DK-1573 Copenhagen V / DK
[1994/51]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1998/09]
Former [1994/51]Wulff, Peter Samuel
c/o NeuroSearch A/S, Smedeland 26B
DK-2600 Glostrup / DK
Application number, filing date94610030.201.06.1994
[1994/51]
Priority number, dateDK1993000069614.06.1993         Original published format: DK 69693
[1994/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0629615
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0629615
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/40, A61K31/40
[1994/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/51]
Extension statesSI03.06.1994
TitleGerman:Indol Derivate als Glutamat Antagonisten[1994/51]
English:Indole derivatives as glutamate antagonists[1994/51]
French:Dérivés d'indole comme glutamate antagonistes[1994/51]
Examination procedure06.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/31]
17.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.1999Fee for grant paid
29.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
IT23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE01.06.2000
LU01.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2005/23]BE23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE01.06.2000
LU01.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
Former [2004/07]BE23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE01.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
Former [2003/08]BE23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE01.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
Former [2002/42]BE23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE01.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
Former [2002/26]BE23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE01.06.2000
Former [2001/50]BE23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE01.06.2000
Former [2001/09]BE23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
Former [2001/08]BE23.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US5192792  (JOHNSON GRAHAM [US]) [A] 1,4 * claim - *
ExaminationEP0667340
 EP0432648
 EP0503349
    - POPP F.D., "Potential anticonvulsants. IX. Some isatin hydrazones and related compounds", J. HET. CHEM., 1984, vol. 21, no. 6, pages 1641 - 1645,
    - HENSEKE G. & BROSCHE P., "Azaoxanoles", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19671225), vol. 67, no. 26, Database accession no. 118105Z,
    - HCNSEL W., "Synthese von 4-(5-Hydroxy-4-pyrazolylimino)-2-pyrazolin-5-onen (Rubazonsäuren) und strukturanalogen Verbindungen", LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1976), no. 7, pages 1380 - 1394,