Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0617120

EP0617120 - Fermentation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.01.2014  [2014/03]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  AT 
LINDE BRV Biowaste Technologies AG
6300 Zug / CH
For:DK  SE 
Schmutz, Urs
Im Föhrenweg 25
4466 Ormalingen / CH
[2000/10]
Former [1997/38]For:BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  AT 
Rindelaub, Frank Alex Erich
Rue des Croix 15 A
CH-2014 Bôle / CH
For:DK  SE 
Schmutz, Urs
Im Föhrenweg 25
4466 Ormalingen / CH
Former [1997/19]For:BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  AT 
Rindelaub, Frank Alex Erich
Rue des Croix 15 A
CH-2014 Bôle / CH
For:CH  DK  LI  SE 
Schmutz, Urs
Föhrenweg 25
4466 Ormalingen / CH
Former [1994/39]For:BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  AT 
Rindelaub, Frank Alex Erich
Rue des Croix 15 A
CH-2014 Bôle / CH
For:CH  DK  LI  SE 
Schmutz, Urs
Herrenweg 45
CH-4494 Oltingen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Rindelaub, Frank Alex Erich
Rue du Verger 11
2014 Bôle / CH
02 / Schmutz, Urs
Im Föhrenweg 25
4466 Ormaligen / CH
[2000/10]
Former [1994/39]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Braun, André jr. , et al
Braunpat Braun Eder AG
Reussstrasse 22
Postfach
4015 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1997/38]Braun, André , et al
Patentanwalt VSP Murtengasse 5
4051 Basel / CH
Former [1997/19]Braun, André
Patentanwalt VSP Murtengasse 5
4051 Basel / CH
Former [1996/49]Martin, Björn
A. Kerr AG Finkelerweg 44
CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH
Former [1994/39]Kerr, Andrew
Postfach 444 Finkelerweg 44
CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH
Application number, filing date94810109.222.02.1994
[1994/39]
Priority number, dateCH1993000057425.02.1993         Original published format: CH 57493
[1994/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0617120
Date:28.09.1994
Language:DE
[1994/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0617120
Date:30.08.1995
Language:DE
[1995/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0617120
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/107, C12M1/02
[1994/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/39]
TitleGerman:Fermentationseinrichtung[1994/39]
English:Fermentation device[1994/39]
French:Dispositif de fermentation[1994/39]
Examination procedure07.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/14]
28.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR31.05.2000
LU22.02.2001
MC28.02.2001
[2014/03]
Former [2006/39]GR31.05.2000
LU22.02.2001
MC28.02.2001
Former [2004/39]GR31.05.2000
LU22.02.2001
Former [2004/07]GR31.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2481873  (NAYET ROGER [FR]) [X] 1-3,7 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 38; figure - * [Y] 1,4;
 [Y]DE3239304  (MAACK H F WAGENFAB [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * page 12 * * page 13, paragraph 1; figure - *;
 [XA]NL8700588  (JOZEF HUBERTUS MARIA GERARDUS) [X] 1 * figures 6,7 * [A] 3