Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0629551 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0629551



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 53
21.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.11.1999 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
03.08.1999 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
26.03.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
22.03.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
19.01.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.01.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
05.01.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
22.10.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.07.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.07.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.05.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
14.08.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
21.09.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.09.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
29.07.1994 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1