Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0629551


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
29.10.1999 Change - request for further processing
28.10.1999 Change - request for further processing
22.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.10.1999 Change - request for further processing
30.07.1999 Application deemed to be withdrawn
06.07.1999 Renewal fee
24.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
24.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
14.01.1999 Communication of intention to grant
11.12.1998 Examination report or reply
22.10.1998 Examination report or reply
13.07.1998 Examination report or reply
10.07.1998 Change - representative published on  26.08.1998 [1998/35]
07.07.1998 Renewal fee
15.05.1998 Examination report or reply
09.07.1997 Renewal fee
17.12.1996 Examination report or reply
09.08.1996 Examination report or reply
09.08.1996 First examination report
04.07.1996 Renewal fee
09.05.1995 Request for examination filed published on  28.06.1995 [1995/26]
04.11.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.12.1994 [1994/51]