Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0629551
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0629551Global Dossier 19.01.2000B1
EP0629551 21.12.1994A1
Priority number Date
ITBO930279 18.06.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69422661D 24.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
ITBO930279 18.06.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69422661T 03.08.2000T2
Priority number Date
ITBO930279 18.06.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2142394T 16.04.2000T3
Priority number Date
ITBO930279 18.06.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IT1263438 05.08.1996B
ITBO930279 19.12.1994A1
ITBO930279D 18.06.1993D0
Priority number Date
ITBO930279 18.06.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5463846 07.11.1995A
Priority number Date
ITBO930279 18.06.1993