Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0629551

EP0629551 - Method and apparatus for wrapping articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUMER S.r.l.
Via Emilia Ovest, 93
41013 Castelfranco Emilia (Modena) / IT
[2000/03]
Former [1994/51]For all designated states
BAUMER S.r.l.
Via Emilia Ovest, 93
I-41013 Castelfranco Emilia (Modena) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Gambetti, Mario
Via Rugginenta 485
I-40014 Crevalcore (BO) / IT
[1994/51]
Representative(s)Gustorf, Gerhard
Bachstrasse 6a
84036 Landshut / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A
84036 Landshut / DE
Former [1994/51]Dall'Olio, Giancarlo
Interbrevetti S.r.l. Via del Cestello 13
I-40124 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date94830290.614.06.1994
[1994/51]
Priority number, dateIT1993BO0027918.06.1993         Original published format: IT BO930279
[1994/51]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0629551
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0629551
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:B65B11/10
[1994/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1994/51]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einwickeln von Gegenständen[1994/51]
English:Method and apparatus for wrapping articles[1994/51]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper des objets[1994/51]
Examination procedure19.04.1995Examination requested  [1995/26]
14.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
26.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Request for further processing for:01.10.1999Request for further processing filed
01.10.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.11.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0229452  (MEAD CORPORATION) [X] 1,2,4,6 * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 39; figure - *;
 [X]EP0049377  (GANZ BROTHERS) [X] 1,2,4,6 * page 9, line 33 - page 11, line 12 * * page 12, line 20 - page 15, line 9; figure - *;
 [A]DE1918037  (WELDOTRON) [A] 1,6 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 22; figure - *;
 [A]US4663914  (R. GANZ)
ExaminationUS5203144
 US5203146