Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0709790

EP0709790 - Fuzzy logic analog processor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/18]Fuzzy logic analog computer architecture
[1999/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CO.RI.M.ME. CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO
Stradale Primosole, 50
95121 Catania / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
CO.RI.M.ME. CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO
Stradale Primosole, 50
95121 Catania / IT
Former [1996/18]For all designated states
CO.RI.M.ME. CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO
Stradale Primosole, 50
I-95121 Catania / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Bruno, Dario
Via Crescenzio 7
I-90142 Palermo / IT
02 / Giacalone, Biagio
Piazza V. Emanuele 33
I-91100 Trapani / IT
03 / Manaresi, Nicolò
Via Tambroni 11
I-40137 Bologna / IT
[1996/18]
Representative(s)Botti, Mario
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Botti, Mario
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5
20124 Milano / IT
Former [1998/12]Botti, Mario
Porta, Checcacci & Botti S.r.l. Viale Sabotino 19/2
20135 Milano / IT
Former [1996/18]Checcacci, Giorgio
PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2
I-20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date94830517.231.10.1994
[1996/18]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0709790
Date:01.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0709790
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:G06G7/26, G05F3/24
[1996/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/18]
TitleGerman:Analog Fuzzy-Logik-Prozessor[1999/18]
English:Fuzzy logic analog processor[1999/18]
French:Processeur analogique à logique floue[1999/18]
Former [1996/18]Architektur eines analogen Fuzzy-Logik-Rechners
Former [1996/18]Fuzzy logic analog computer architecture
Former [1996/18]Architecture d'un ordinateur analogique à logique floue
Examination procedure21.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/01]
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.1999Fee for grant paid
29.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0617359  (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *