Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0672038

EP0672038 - HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zeneca Limited
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/38]For all designated states
ZENECA LIMITED
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / KAY, Ian Trevor
'Chy-An-Ryn' Love Lane, Mousehole, Penzance
Cornwall TK19 65X / GB
02 / BARTON, John Edward Duncan
Brook Cottage, North Stoke
Oxfordshire OX10 6BL / GB
03 / COLLINS, David John
10 Ardwell Close, Crowthorne
Berkshire RG11 6BA / GB
04 / KOWALCZYK, Bogdan
4 Dean Grove, Wokingham
Berkshire RG11 1WD / GB
05 / MITCHELL, Glynn
32 Westwood Green, Cookham
Berkshire SL6 9DD / GB
06 / SHRIBBS, John, Martin
108 Wyndham Way
Petaluma, CA 94954 / US
07 / COX, John Michael
412a Finchampstead Road, Wokingham
Berkshire RG11 3RA / GB
08 / BARNES, Nigel John
Rose Cottage, Newlands Drive, Maidenhead
Berkshire SL6 4LL / GB
09 / SMITH, Stephen Chrisopher
11 Mendip Road, Forest Park, Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 3XG / GB
[1995/38]
Representative(s)Waterman, John Richard
Syngenta Limited - IP Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell
Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/38]Waterman, John Richard
Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Agrochemicals Jealott's Hill Research Station P.O. Box 3538
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 6YA / GB
Application number, filing date94900212.516.11.1993
[1995/38]
WO1993GB02350
Priority number, dateGB1992002537704.12.1992         Original published format: GB 9225377
[1995/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9413652
Date:23.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0672038
Date:20.09.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994
[1995/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0672038
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.1994
ClassificationInternational:C07D277/14, A01N43/78, C07D261/04, C07D207/273, A01N43/36, C07D279/12, C07D233/38, C07D239/10, C07D211/76, C07D285/16, C07D265/02
[1995/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/38]
TitleGerman:HERBIZIDE[1995/38]
English:HERBICIDES[1995/38]
French:HERBICIDES[1995/38]
Entry into regional phase04.07.1995National basic fee paid 
04.07.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
06.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.1999Fee for grant paid
14.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/23]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0200415  (UNIROYAL CHEM CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]US4956006  (WOOLARD FRANK X [US]) [A] 1,13,14 * claims 1,19-54 *;
 [DA]FR2103004  (ICI LTD) [DA] 1,13,14 * claims 1,4-7 *;
 [DA]FR2129674  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [DA] 1,13,14 * claims 1,8-13 *