Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0773767

EP0773767 - A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURING OF AN ABSORBENT STRUCTURE AND AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE COMPRISING AN ABSORBENT STRUCTURE MANUFACTURED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[1999/25]
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
Mölnlycke AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WIDLUND, Urban
Päronvägen 5
S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE
02 / ÖSTERDAHL, Eje
Rödingsgatan 13
S-421 58 Västra Frölunda / SE
03 / HANSSON, Roy
Alegardsgatan 112
S-431 45 Mölndal / SE
04 / KOLAR, Milan
Saturnusvägen 36
S-854 68 Sundsvall / SE
[2000/03]
Former [1997/21]01 / WIDLUND, Urban
Päronvägen 5
S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE
02 / ÖSTERDAHL, Eje
Rödingsgatan 13
S-421 58 Västra Frölunda / SE
03 / HANSSON, Roy
Aleg rdsgatan 112
S-431 45 Mölndal / SE
04 / KOLAR, Milan
Saturnusvägen 36
S-854 68 Sundsvall / SE
Representative(s)Larsson, Karin , et al
Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]Larsson, Karin , et al
H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 3137
103 62 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date94901111.815.11.1993
[1997/21]
WO1993SE00973
Priority number, dateSE1992000344517.11.1992         Original published format: SE 9203445
[1997/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9410955
Date:26.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773767
Date:21.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994
[1997/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773767
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE26.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[1997/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/21]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ABSORBIERENDEN STRUKTUR SOWIE ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINER GEMäSS DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTEN STRUKTUR[1997/21]
English:A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURING OF AN ABSORBENT STRUCTURE AND AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE COMPRISING AN ABSORBENT STRUCTURE MANUFACTURED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD[1997/21]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE ABSORBANTE ET ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPORTANT UNE STRUCTURE ABSORBANTE FABRIQUEE SELON LEDIT PROCEDE[1997/21]
Entry into regional phase15.05.1995National basic fee paid 
15.05.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.05.1995Examination requested  [1997/21]
08.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1999Fee for grant paid
03.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2002/26]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9005808  (SCA PULP AB [SE]);
 [A]US4610678  (WEISMAN PAUL T [US], et al)