Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0646000

EP0646000 - COMPOSITIONS USING MICROENCAPSULATED NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CORPORATION OF MERCER UNIVERSITY
1400 Coleman Avenue
Macon, GA 31207 / US
[1995/14]
Inventor(s)01 / D'SOUZA, Martin J.
5250 Oaks Landing
Sugar Hill, GA 30518 / US
02 / OETTINGER, Carl William
747 Houston Mill Road, N.E., Number 4
Atlanta, GA 30329 / US
03 / OLIVER, James Cameron
1679 Cartright Court
Decatur, GA 30033 / US
[1995/14]
Representative(s)Loven, Keith James , et al
Loven
Patents & Trademarks
West Central
Runcorn Road
Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Loven, Keith James , et al
Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street
Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB
Former [1995/14]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date94902270.116.11.1993
[1995/14]
WO1993US11126
Priority number, dateUS1992097705716.11.1992         Original published format: US 977057
[1995/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9410980
Date:26.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0646000
Date:05.04.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994
[1995/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.05.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/14, A61K9/52, A61K37/02, A61K37/04, A61K37/66, A61K9/51, A61K9/16
[1997/16]
Former International [1995/14]A61K9/14, A61K9/52, A61K37/02, A61K37/04, A61K37/66
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/14]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE MIKROVERKAPSELTE NEUTRALISIERENDE ANTIKÖRPER ENTHALTEN[1995/14]
English:COMPOSITIONS USING MICROENCAPSULATED NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES[1995/14]
French:COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES ANTICORPS DE NEUTRALISATION MICROENCAPSULES[1995/14]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1994National basic fee paid 
21.10.1994Search fee paid 
21.10.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.1994Examination requested  [1995/14]
08.12.1994Request for decision received: (all rights)
13.06.1995Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected
08.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
18.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/19]
02.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/19]
Appeal following examination03.08.1995Appeal received No.  J0006/96
23.10.1995Statement of grounds filed
01.10.1996Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1996/40]
11.12.1996Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/50]
18.09.1997Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal
18.09.1997Date of oral proceedings
13.10.1997Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:25.04.2001Request for further processing filed
04.05.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.05.2001Decision despatched
02.05.2001Request for further processing filed
04.05.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
14.05.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.09.1994AT   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994BE   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994CH   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994DK   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994ES   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994GR   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994IE   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994NL   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
23.09.1994SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1994
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200210   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0333523  (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION ;SOUTHERN RES INST (US)) [XY] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 11;
 [XY]US5075109  (TICE THOMAS R ET AL) [XY] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 11;
 [XY]US5069936  (YEN RICHARD C K) [XY] 1-7,10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9,11;
 [XYA]EP0467389  (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND) [XY] 1-4,6,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 5,7-11,14,15;
 [XY]EP0307097  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [XY] 1,5,15 * the whole document *;
 [XYA]WO9112882  (MEDGENIX GROUP SA) [XY] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15;
 [A]WO8801213  (CLINICAL TECHNOLOGIES ASS);
 [A]US5000960  (WALLACH DONALD F H)
International search[Y]US4671954  ;
 [Y]US4349530
 [Y]  - Nature, Volume 330, issued 17 December 1987, K.J. TRACEY et al., "Anti-Cachectin/TNF Monoclonal Antibodies Prevent Septic Shock During Lethal Bacteraemia", pages 662-664, entire document.
 [Y]  - Drug Development and Industrial Pharmacy, Volume 14, Number 10, issued 1988, M.J. D'SOUZA, "Controlled Release of Cyclosporine from Microspheres", pages 1351-57, entire document.