Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0646000 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0646000



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 472
14.03.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 2
07.01.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
02.12.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.06.2002 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.06.2002 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.06.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.06.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.05.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.05.2001 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
08.05.2001 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
02.05.2001 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.04.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
25.04.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.01.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.01.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.09.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.09.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.05.2000 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.05.2000 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.04.2000 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
26.04.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.04.2000 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.04.2000 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
14.02.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.10.1998 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.1998 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.10.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.07.1998 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.01.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.01.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.12.1997 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
04.12.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.11.1997 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
13.10.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.09.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 14
18.09.1997 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
22.05.1997 Maintenance of the application Appeal 1
17.04.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
17.04.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.04.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.04.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.03.1997 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Appeal 1
24.03.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 2
14.03.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.03.1997 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
11.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
01.10.1996 Communication with time limit Appeal 4
28.03.1996 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.03.1996 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
23.10.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
19.06.1995 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.06.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 5
03.06.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.02.1995 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.12.1994 Request for a decision Search / examination 1
14.11.1994 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
03.11.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.10.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
25.10.1994 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.10.1994 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
23.09.1994 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
21.07.1994 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.07.1994 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 140
11.07.1994 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.05.1994 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.05.1994 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 140
26.05.1994 Priority document Search / examination 58