Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0729409

EP0729409 - METAL PIPE WITH INTEGRALLY FORMED LINER AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W.E. Hall Company
P.O. Box 2450, 471 North Newport Avenue Nr. 205
Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US
[1996/36]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDRE, James, R.
2615 Bunya Street
Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US
[1996/36]
Representative(s)Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Ltd
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans
Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/36]Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date94902377.418.11.1993
[1996/36]
WO1993US11421
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9513917
Date:26.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0729409
Date:04.09.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995
[1996/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.05.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B32B15/00, B29D23/00
[1996/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/36]
TitleGerman:METALLROHR MIT INTEGRIERTEM FUTTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN[1996/36]
English:METAL PIPE WITH INTEGRALLY FORMED LINER AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME[1996/36]
French:CONDUITE METALLIQUE AVEC UNE CHEMISE INTEGREE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE CONDUITE[1996/36]
Entry into regional phase28.05.1996National basic fee paid 
28.05.1996Search fee paid 
28.05.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/36]
16.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/31]
03.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200210   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4964440  (ANDRE JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, line 9 - column 11, line 7; figures 1-17 *;
 [Y]US5178902  (WONG DENNIS [CA], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 54; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4606953  (SUZUKI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 44; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR1307015  (ANSELM ANTHONY CESAR) [A] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 8; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US3126306  (SHERMAN O.B.) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 29 - line 54; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]EP0067060  (TAIYO STEEL [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 8 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 16 * * page 4, line 15 - line 34 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 10 *;
 [E]US5316606  (ANDRE JAMES R [US]) [E] 1-9 * claims 1-16 *
International search[X]US4460632  (ADUR ASHOK M [US], et al);
 [Y]US4630650  (DAVIS PAUL K [US]);
 [Y]US5023115  (MIZUHASHI TOSHIHIKO [JP]);
 [Y]US4304266  (KUTNYAK THOMAS A, et al);
 [Y]US4743329  (HATA RYOSUKE [JP])